Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Łaski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1456¹BornŁasku
1471¹15.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 150852.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland
20 Apr 151054.3SucceededArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 May 151054.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
19 May 153175.4DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Łaski:
Archbishop Jan Łaski (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014