Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Amicinus (Przyjaciel)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Aug 1503AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
9 Aug 1503AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria
11 Feb 1504Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria
16 Oct 1526DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Amicinus (Przyjaciel)
Bishop Jan Amicinus (Przyjaciel) (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPiotrków Trybunalski

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 172
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,906
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast