Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erazm Ciołek

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1474²Born
1502²28.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 150329.9AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
4 Feb 150430.0Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
9 Sep 152248.6DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Erazm Ciołek (VIAF: 40112170)
Bishop Erazm Ciołek (born 1474, died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Ordained BishopPiotrków Trybunalski
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,279
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast