Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakub Buczacki

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jun 1510AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
21 Mar 1512Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
5 Nov 1518AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
29 Jul 1538AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
6 May 1541DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jakub Buczacki:
Bishop Jakub Buczacki (died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 276, and Page 164
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 148
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 192, Number 15,586

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013