Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrzej Krzycki

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1482Born
8 Jun 152340.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
4 Oct 152341.2Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
29 Apr 152744.8AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
27 Oct 153553.3AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
10 May 153754.8DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Krzycki (VIAF: 3542950)
Archbishop Andrzej Krzycki (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrzycko
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 276
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,911
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1523, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast