Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Dantyszek

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1485Born
3 Aug 153044.7AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
14 Sep 153347.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
11 Jan 153852.1AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
27 Oct 154862.9DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Dantyszek (VIAF: 5031671)
Bishop Jan Dantyszek (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGdańsk
Ordained BishopPłock, Diocese of Płock

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327, and Page 182
  • ob/c23: CB, 30 Jun 2015
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,516

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast