Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tiedemann Bartłomiej Giese

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1480Born
1 Aug 153656.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
11 Jan 153857.6ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
Mar 1538³57.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
25 Jan 154968.6SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
20 May 154968.9ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
23 Oct 155070.3DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tiedemann Bartłomiej Giese (VIAF: 32819965)
Bishop Tiedemann Bartłomiej Giese (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGdańsk
Ordained BishopFrauenburg
Death PlaceHeilsburg

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327, and Page 182
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast