Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurycy Ferber

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1471¹Born
14 Apr 152352.2SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
17 Jul 152352.5ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
28 Oct 152352.8Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
1 Jul 153766.5DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurycy Ferber (VIAF: 80996984)
Bishop Maurycy Ferber (born 1471, died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGdańsku

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,915

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast