Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas del Pozzo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy

Titular Bishop of Antipatris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1706Born
22 Sep 173125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Messina, Italy
26 Sep 178579.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
26 Sep 178579.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
6 Nov 178579.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipatris
2 May 179690.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Thomas del Pozzo
Bishop Thomas del Pozzo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastroreale

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 89, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,785, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast