Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Geronimo (Girolamo) Doria, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nebbio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1630Born
19 Sep 165424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
16 Nov 167141.1AppointedBishop of Nebbio, France
22 Nov 167141.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbio, France
Dec 1702³72.2DiedBishop of Nebbio, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Geronimo (Girolamo) Doria
Bishop Giovanni Geronimo (Girolamo) Doria C.R.S. (born , died Dec 1702) Bishop of Nebbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pier d'Arena

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast