Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis du Lau d’Allemans

Deceased

Bishop of Digne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1708¹BornPérigord
27 May 174234.4SelectedBishop of Digne, France
24 Sep 174234.7ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
21 Oct 174234.8Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
15 Sep 174638.7DiedBishop of Digne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis du Lau d’Allemans:
Bishop Jean-Louis du Lau d’Allemans (born 1708, died ) Bishop of Digne

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015