Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Fiacre de Grave

Deceased

Bishop of Valence, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1724Born
15 Dec 177147.9SelectedBishop of Valence, France
30 Mar 177248.2ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
26 Apr 177248.3Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
1 Jul 178763.4DiedBishop of Valence, France

MicroData Summary for François-Fiacre de Grave
Bishop François-Fiacre de Grave (born , died ) Bishop of Valence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 430
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,600
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast