Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Antonio De Riso, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1824BornCatanzaro
6 Jan 184521.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Aug 184622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Aug 188359.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy
9 Aug 188359.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
15 Aug 188359.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
23 Aug 188359.6SucceededBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
28 May 190076.4DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Antonio De Riso:
Bishop Bernardo Antonio De Riso O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 120, and Page 191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013