Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Gaetani d’Aragona, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1815Born
27 Jan 183923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Aug 188367.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Severo, Italy
9 Aug 188367.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinitis
15 Aug 188367.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinitis
25 Apr 188973.4SucceededBishop of San Severo, Italy
9 Feb 189377.2DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Gaetani d’Aragona (VIAF: 89042359)
Bishop Bernardo Gaetani d’Aragona O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFormia, Diocese of Gaeta
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 515, and Page 519
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017