Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Casimirus Damokos, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic

Titular Bishop of Coronea

Titular See: (Moldavia)


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1668AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
17 Jun 1668Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coronea
18 Jun 1668AppointedVicar Apostolic of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
19 Dec 1672AppointedVicar Apostolic
5 Sep 1677DiedTitular Bishop of Coronea

MicroData Summary for Casimirus Damokos:
Bishop Casimirus Damokos O.F.M. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of (unknown)

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 111, and Page 173
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 385
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015