Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard d’Abbadie d’Arbocave

Deceased

Bishop of Acqs (Dax)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹BornMaslacq
1 Nov 169038.8SelectedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
5 May 169240.3ConfirmedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
26 Oct 169240.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
14 Dec 173280.9DiedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard d’Abbadie d’Arbocave:
Bishop Bernard d’Abbadie d’Arbocave (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Acqs (Dax)

  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 93
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015