Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Christoph von Crass

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1686BornPaderborn
25 May 170923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
9 Mar 174659.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
9 Mar 174659.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
22 May 174660.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
6 Mar 175164.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Christoph von Crass:
Bishop Johann Christoph von Crass (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 195, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013