Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Costantino

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1674¹BornSan Cesario
24 Jan 171844.0AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
6 Feb 171844.0Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
Nov 1749³75.8DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Costantino:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Costantino (born 1674, died Nov 1749) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 148
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,467
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 13
  • bp/ob: CB, 1 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015