Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafino Corio, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1628BornMilano
15 Jul 166941.5AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
19 Jul 166941.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
21 Apr 167143.3DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Serafino Corio:
Bishop Serafino Corio C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 238
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,570

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013