Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Maria Conigli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cefalonia e Zante


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹BornVenice
6 May 167554.3AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
26 May 167554.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
7 Oct 169473.7ResignedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
1704²83.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Maria Conigli:
Bishop Giacinto Maria Conigli O.P. (born 1621, died 1704) Bishop Emeritus of Cefalonia e Zante

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 154
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,898
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015