Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felicissimo Coccino (Cocchino), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Galla, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1816¹Born
18 Dec 185539.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Galla, Ethiopia
18 Dec 185539.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
3 May 185943.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
16 Feb 187357.1ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Galla, Ethiopia
27 Feb 187862.1DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Galla, Ethiopia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felicissimo Coccino (Cocchino)
Bishop Felicissimo Coccino (Cocchino) O.F.M. Cap. (born 1816, died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Galla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortemilia

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 368
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast