Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Basilio Clari (Clary), O.S.B.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1778BornRoma
1794¹15.9ProfessedMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
28 Feb 180123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
8 May 181840.2SelectedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
25 May 181840.3ConfirmedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
31 May 181840.3Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
20 Jun 182345.3SelectedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
17 Nov 182345.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
15 Feb 185880.0DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Basilio Clari (Clary):
Archbishop Michele Basilio Clari (Clary) O.S.B.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 106, and Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013