Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Civatelli

Deceased

Bishop of Scardona (Skradin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648²BornZadar
19 Dec 169850.9AppointedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
24 May 169951.3Ordained BishopBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
8 Nov 171365.8DiedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Civatelli:
Bishop Gregorio Civatelli (died ) Bishop of Scardona (Skradin)

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 346
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015