Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Antonio Cimaglia

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1753BornSan Georgii la Molara
20 Sep 177724.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181865.0SelectedBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
25 May 181865.2ConfirmedBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
31 May 181865.2Ordained BishopBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
14 Jun 181865.2SelectedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
2 Oct 181865.5ConfirmedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
Jul 1819³66.3DiedBishop of Molfetta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Antonio Cimaglia:
Bishop Domenico Antonio Cimaglia (born ) Bishop of Molfetta

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 227, and Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013