Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Castelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Naxos


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1844AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
6 Oct 1844Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
13 Jun 1852DiedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Domenico Castelli:
Archbishop Domenico Castelli O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Naxos

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013