Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicol˛ Caracciolo, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1699Born
2 May 172222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
17 Jan 175454.6SelectedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
1 Apr 175454.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
7 Apr 175454.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
23 Sep 176667.3ResignedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
17 Apr 177474.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicol˛ Caracciolo (VIAF: 88875079)
Archbishop Nicol˛ Caracciolo C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 238
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1754, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018