Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Francesco Caprini (Carpi)

Deceased

Bishop of Bitetto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1663³BornL'Aquila
20 Dec 168724.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Jun 168926.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 171854.7AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
6 Feb 171854.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bitetto, Italy
20 Apr 172965.9DiedBishop of Bitetto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Francesco Caprini (Carpi):
Bishop Gioacchino Francesco Caprini (Carpi) (born , died ) Bishop of Bitetto

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,469
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 15
  • ob: CB, 1 Sep 2015
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015