Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Canova, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv

Titular Bishop of Croae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1806¹BornGaressio
1823¹17.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Jul 184337.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
14 Dec 184742.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
26 Mar 184842.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
10 Aug 186660.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Canova:
Bishop Andrea Canova O.F.M. Cap. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 231
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013