Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Tristan de Cambon

Deceased

Bishop of Mirepoix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1716¹BornToulouse
3 Apr 176852.2SelectedBishop of Mirepoix, France
20 Jun 176852.4ConfirmedBishop of Mirepoix, France
10 Jul 176852.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
20 Nov 179175.8DiedBishop of Mirepoix, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Tristan de Cambon: VIAF:188468094
Bishop François-Tristan de Cambon (born 1716, died ) Bishop of Mirepoix

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015