Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oronzo Caldarola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Diano-Teggiano

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1871BornBitonto
1 Sep 189523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
8 May 191644.5AppointedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
29 Jun 191644.6Ordained BishopBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
27 Nov 195483.0RetiredBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
27 Nov 195483.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
6 Feb 196391.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Diano-Teggiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Oronzo Caldarola:
Bishop Oronzo Caldarola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Diano-Teggiano

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,895
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013