Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Bruno

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1824Born
27 Mar 188258.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
27 Mar 188258.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
2 Apr 188258.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madaurus
8 Jul 188460.3SucceededBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
10 Jan 189368.8DiedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bruno (VIAF: 88826078)
Bishop Luigi Bruno (born , died ) Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBattaglia, Diocese of Policastro
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 358, and Page 487
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017