Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Albrecht Cardinal von Brandenburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

Apostolic Administrator of Halberstadt

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1490BornSchloß zu Cölln
4 Apr 151322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lebus, Germany
31 Aug 151323.2SelectedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
25 Sep 151323.2SelectedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
2 Dec 151323.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
16 Dec 151323.5ConfirmedApostolic Administrator of Halberstadt, Germany
9 Mar 151423.7SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
2 Jul 151424.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
18 Aug 151424.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
24 Mar 151827.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jul 151828.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
5 Jan 152130.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
24 Sep 154555.2DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Albrecht von Brandenburg:
Albrecht Cardinal von Brandenburg (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
  • a cardinal for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1518
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,670

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Jul 2014