Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes von Schlabrendorff, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Havelberg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Aug 1501SelectedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
3 Dec 1501ConfirmedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
16 Jul 1503Ordained BishopBishop of Havelberg, Germany
12 Aug 1520DiedBishop of Havelberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes von Schlabrendorff
Bishop Johannes von Schlabrendorff O. Praem. (died ) Bishop of Havelberg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Havelberg, Diocese of Havelberg

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 208
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast