Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Schönberg

Deceased

Bishop of Naumburg


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1483AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Naumburg, Germany
15 Mar 1492SucceededBishop of Naumburg, Germany
13 May 1492Ordained BishopBishop of Naumburg, Germany
26 Sep 1517DiedBishop of Naumburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Schönberg:
Bishop Johann von Schönberg (died ) Bishop of Naumburg

  • a bishop for 25.4 years

Source(s):
  • b/ob: CB, 23 Mar 2104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Mar 2014