Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Schigmers, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

Titular Bishop of Daulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1489Born
7 Apr 152940.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
7 Apr 152940.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
30 May 152940.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daulia
154152.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Schigmers:
Bishop Nikolaus Schigmers O.S.A. , Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Jul 2014