Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp von Flersheim

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1481BornKaiserslautern
17 Apr 152342.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Worms, Germany
18 Dec 152343.0ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Worms, Germany
22 Oct 152948.8SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
19 Jan 153049.0ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
27 Mar 153049.2Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
14 Aug 155271.6DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp von Flersheim:
Bishop Philipp von Flersheim (died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013