Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balthasar Maerklin

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1479Born
6 May 152748.3SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
Sep 152748.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
9 Mar 153051.1ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
9 Mar 153051.1ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
3 Jul 153051.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
28 May 153152.4DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Balthasar Maerklin
Bishop Balthasar Maerklin (born 1479, died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaldkirch
Ordained BishopAugsburg
Death PlaceTrier, Archdiocese of Trier

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 210
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1530, Number 11
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,560

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast