Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hieronymus Schultz, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Havelberg


Events

DateEventTitle
1487ProfessedMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
1507SelectedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
6 Oct 1507ConfirmedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
12 Apr 1521AppointedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
29 Oct 1522DiedBishop of Havelberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hieronymus Schultz:
Bishop Hieronymus Schultz O. Praem. (died ) Bishop of Havelberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013