Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Biondo, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Dec 1637AppointedBishop of Capri, Italy
3 Jan 1638Ordained BishopBishop of Capri, Italy
3 Dec 1640AppointedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
21 Dec 1643DiedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Biondo
Bishop Francesco Antonio Biondo O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Severino

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 100, Number 606
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 133, and Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1638, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018