Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Saggese

Deceased

Bishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1615Born
24 Sep 163924.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 166751.5AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
8 Feb 169478.4DiedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Saggese
Bishop Giuseppe Saggese (born , died ) Bishop of Ravello e Scala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpineto Superiore, Archdiocese of Salerno
Ordained PriestSan Francesco dei Frati Minori Convnetuali, Church, Ravello, Diocese of Ravello e Scala
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Ravello, Diocese of Ravello e Scala

  • a priest for 54.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 292
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 37
  • bp: CB, 13 Aug 2017
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018