Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Antonio Bianchi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Modena, Italy

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1714Born
22 Mar 173824.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 177662.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Modena, Italy
15 Apr 177662.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
23 Jun 177662.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
9 Aug 177864.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Modena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Antonio Bianchi
Bishop Felice Antonio Bianchi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Cristoforo, Diocese of Acqui
Ordained BishopSant’Agostino, Church, Modena, Diocese of Modena
Death PlaceSoliera, Diocese of Modena

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,214
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 333, and Page 451
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,776, Number 15
  • c34/loc: AT, 17 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,200

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast