Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Agostino Bertozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1704³BornFano
20 Dec 172723.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 175450.0AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
29 Dec 175450.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
20 Sep 180297.8DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Agostino Bertozzi:
Bishop Lodovico Agostino Bertozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli

  • a priest for 74.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 141
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015