Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Bermudez de Castro

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1678³Born
20 Nov 172446.8AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
17 Jun 172547.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
25 Aug 172850.6InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
13 Nov 172951.8DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlos Bermudez de Castro
Archbishop Carlos Bermudez de Castro (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla, México
Ordained BishopMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 27
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,957

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jun 2020

Quantcast