Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Bergeretti, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Naxos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1812Born
19 Dec 183523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
29 Jul 185643.9AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
7 Sep 185644.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
22 Aug 186249.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Naxos, Greece
22 Aug 186249.9AppointedTitular Bishop of ArsinoŽ in Arcadia
24 Mar 186451.5SucceededArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
13 May 187562.7DiedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Bergeretti
Archbishop Lorenzo Bergeretti O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Archbishop of Naxos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGiaveno
Ordained BishopIzmir, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 124, and Page 404
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 498
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1856, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017