Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Heinrich Johannes Willibrord Benzler, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Metz

Titular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1853BornNiederhemer, Germany
15 Aug 187521.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Aug 187723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Sep 190147.9SelectedBishop of Metz, France
21 Sep 190147.9ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
28 Oct 190148.0Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
31 Jul 191965.8ResignedBishop of Metz, France
31 Jul 191965.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
16 Apr 192167.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Karl Heinrich Johannes Willibrord Benzler:
Archbishop Karl Heinrich Johannes Willibrord Benzler O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Metz

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 381
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 60
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 15 Jan 2014