Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista a Santa Margarita Pietro Alessandro Banfi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1739BornMilano
22 Jul 181676.6AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
28 Jul 181676.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
12 Nov 181777.9DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista a Santa Margarita Pietro Alessandro Banfi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista a Santa Margarita Pietro Alessandro Banfi O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013