Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Ebebe Ayah

Bishop of Uyo, Nigeria

Apostolic Administrator of Ogoja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1959 Born
24 Jul 199333.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ogoja, Nigeria
14 Oct 200646.8AppointedBishop of Ogoja, Nigeria
6 Jan 200747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ogoja, Nigeria
5 Jul 201454.5AppointedBishop of Uyo, Nigeria
5 Jul 201454.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ogoja, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John Ebebe Ayah
Bishop John Ebebe Ayah (born ) Bishop of Uyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuja-Obanliku

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uyo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,321
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017