Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Maria Avarna

Deceased

Bishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1758BornMessina
21 Dec 178224.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 180142.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
23 Feb 180142.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Major
Mar 180142.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Major
22 May 181859.6SelectedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
26 Jun 181859.7ConfirmedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
1841¹82.2DiedBishop of Nicosia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria Avarna:
Bishop Gaetano Maria Avarna (born ) Bishop of Nicosia

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 401, and Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013