Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alberico Cardinal Archinto

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1698BornMilano, Italy
26 May 173637.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 173940.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
1 Nov 173940.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
17 Nov 173941.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
1 Mar 174647.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
Apr 1746³47.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
12 Mar 175455.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
5 Apr 175657.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 175657.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
10 Sep 175657.8AppointedSecretary of State
20 Sep 175657.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
30 Sep 175859.8DiedSecretary of State

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alberico Archinto (VIAF: 89086435)
Alberico Cardinal Archinto (born , died ) Secretary of State

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
  • a cardinal for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1756
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 35
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Oct 2016