Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco d’Alessandria

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1743Born
14 Mar 176724.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 180562.4AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
30 Jun 180562.4Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
15 Jan 181875.0DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco d’Alessandria
Bishop Giovanni Francesco d’Alessandria (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Leone

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,805, Number 16
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast